Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 780 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6385 Week
» 17932 Month
» 417614 Year
» 494201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2873   11/1918

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1918
Withdrawal During 12/1964
Service Life 46 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 30/09/1950
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 19/05/1951
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/02/1954
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/10/1954
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 14/07/1956
86J Aberdare 4w/e 03/10/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXE Exeter 4w/e 25/01/1947
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as GWR Number 2873
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 2873    

prev prev