Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 69 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4926 Week
» 16631 Month
» 348120 Year
» 424707 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 2874   11/1918

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1918
Withdrawal During 05/1963
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/11/1955
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/03/1956
88J Aberdare 4w/e 31/12/1960
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STB Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 05/10/1946
ALLOC BAN Banbury 4w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC STB Stourbridge Junction m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   4w/e 01/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as GWR Number 2874
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 2874    

prev prev