Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 427 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 427 Week
» 22933 Month
» 326123 Year
» 1547688 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2890 on 08/04/1938

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 321
To Service Wed 08/04/1938
Withdrawal Wed 21/04/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 27 yrs , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 08/04/1938
81C Southall 4w/e 08/10/1955
84C Banbury 4w/e 01/11/1958
82C Swindon 4w/e 28/11/1959
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 28/09/1963
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 22/02/1964
87A Neath (Court Sart) 6w/e 13/04/1964
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn on 21/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHR Chester West on 14/10/1948
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 28/11/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 24/02/1964
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 13/04/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Swindon Works New Work May: Nos. 7018 Drysllwyn Castle (originally intended to have been named Cranbrook Castle) LDR (24/5), 7019 Fowey Castle BRD (27/5), *7020 Gloucester Castle (31/5); *9682 (6/5). *Not allocated. Nos. 7018-20 are painted dark green and lined. Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle and 7022 were nearly complete on 2/6; while on the same day No. 1500 had the motion, wheels, boiler and cab erected, No. 1501 cylinders, etc., erected, No. 1502 frames only and Nos. 7023/24 frames and cylinders only. Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. p23 (Petrol), 100A1, 1017, 1419/43, 2061 (closed cab), 2212/14/61/91, 2568, 2800/03/24/76/78/90, 3010/32, 3102/64/74, 3815/24/35, 4052/58/73/82, 4224, 4377, 4516/28/39, 4676, 4805/11/55/57 (for re-conversion to coal-burning), 4903/13/33/67/91/94, 5003/09/36/43/46/60/66/93/98, 5142, 5325/62, 5406, 5503/07/43/51, 5755/75/77, 5925/34/75/82, 6000/10/11/14, 6162/63 (both fitted with deconcentrating gear), 6346/57/62/73, 6710/16/24/31, 6823/40/61/68/73, 6931/36/43, 7222, 7321, 7704/90/94, 7806/07, 8701/41, 9613, 9700/10, 70836, 90357, 1299. Condemned: Nos. 277, 2756/89 (all acting as Works pilots), 30, 280 (still retains original boiler and has round topped tanks), 3400/43, 3577 (open cab), 5117. Nos. 6105/30 have had the footsteps set further inwards. No. E1299 failed here with a hot box on 11/5, after having worked the Grimsby fish train. Nos. 2863 (ex 4805) and 2853 (ex 4810) have been re-converted to coal-burning. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1015, 4949/86 an 5973. Nos. 1015, 5074 and 6936 have received tenders with the new crest. Lining: Commencing with No. 5069 (ex Works 12/5), all locomotives painted dark green or black and fully lined are having the cylinders lined out with two red I' vertical bands at both ends. In addition No. 5069 also had the cleating bands lined, but subsequent locomotives (including No. 7018) have not had this done. SLS/194907
18/08/1963 Swindon Works (In store on shed) Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1938 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2890
Built at Swindon Works
   
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
21/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 2890    

prev prev