Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1097 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18900 Week
» 71916 Month
» 191443 Year
» 3218296 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D291 |
29/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40091 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
29/08/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
02/09/1984 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1988 |
Cut At |
A Hampton (at Crewe Works) |
Information |
Poor mechanical condition.bogie fractures, Cut at Crewe Works |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
29/08/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/08/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
13/11/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D291 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
14/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40091 |
|
|
02/09/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40091 |
|
|
12/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A Hampton: at Crewe Works |
|
|