Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 44 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17847 Week
» 70863 Month
» 190390 Year
» 3217243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11500 |
25/12/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2950 |
19/04/1958 |
|
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
32B |
|
Ipswich (New) |
on |
25/12/1954 |
50D |
|
Goole |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/12/1967 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/12/1954 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11500 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2950 |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2950 |
|
|
01/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Thyssen Ltd: Llanelli |
|
|