Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11503 24/01/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2953 29/10/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 01
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
To Service 24/01/1956
Withdrawn 19/06/1966
Time in Service 10 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys
Information Sold to Thames Matex Ltd. w/e 1966-06-25
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 24/01/1956
   Withdrawn 19/06/1966

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to D2953    
24/01/1956 To Service To service as 11503
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
19/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 11503    

prev