Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 821 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 2729 Week
» 18927 Month
» 183827 Year
» 694929 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11506 30/03/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2956 21/03/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 01
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
To Service 30/03/1956
Withdrawn 29/05/1966
Time in Service 10 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys
Information On withdrawal this loco was sold to A. King & Sons Ltd., Norwich, Scrap Merchants. It was used as the yard shunter, moving withdrawn stock into position for cutting.
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 30/03/1956
9D Newton Heath w/e 01/05/1965
36A Doncaster w/e 05/02/1966
   Withdrawn 29/05/1966

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1956 To Service To service as 11506
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
14/03/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D2956    
01/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
29/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as D2956    

prev prev