Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 36 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 17289 Month
» 186061 Year
» 1070442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11507 06/03/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2957 13/04/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D1/3
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Ruston & Hornsby
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/03/1956
Withdrawn 12/03/1967
Time in Service 11 yrs , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1967
Cut At Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40B Immingham (New) 06/03/1956
30A Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957
50D Goole w/e 13/08/1966
   Withdrawn 12/03/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/03/1956 To Service To service as 11507
Built at Ruston & Hornsby
Allocated to Immingham (40B)
   
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/04/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D2957    
13/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
12/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D2957    
01/08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev