Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 37 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5469 Week
» 17290 Month
» 186062 Year
» 1070443 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11508 28/05/1956
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2958 19/04/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D1/3
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Ruston & Hornsby
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/05/1956
Withdrawn 14/01/1968
Time in Service 11 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1984
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
40B Immingham (New) 28/05/1956
30A Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957
   Withdrawn 14/01/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/05/1956 To Service To service as 11508
Built at Ruston & Hornsby
Allocated to Immingham (40B)
   
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/04/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D2958    
14/01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D2958    
01/10/1984 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev