Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1019 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18822 Week
» 71838 Month
» 191365 Year
» 3218218 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Original) |
175 |
m/e |
03/1905 |
Great Western Railway |
2975 |
on |
28/12/1912 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
Saint |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
154 |
Works Number |
2109 |
To Service |
During 03/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 30/11/1944 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1905 |
BRD |
|
Bristol Bath Road |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/11/1944 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1911 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1913 |
D4 boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/12/1942 |
GWR Notes |
New 'Hall' 6946 was seen in PDN on 12/12/42.. The loco. on the goods train in the Appleford accident was 2975 Lord Palmer, extensively damaged. The engine of the express (4088) was not affected. |
SLS/194302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 175 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2109 |
|
|
1907 |
Naming |
Named 'VISCOUNT CHURCHILL' |
|
|
05/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
28/12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2975 |
|
|
01/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: D4 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1924 |
Naming |
Renamed 'SIR ERNEST PALMER' |
|
|
10/1933 |
Naming |
Renamed 'LORD PALMER' |
|
|
10/1933 |
Naming |
Renamed 'LORD PALMER' |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
30/11/1944 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2975 |
|
|