Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2987 |
16/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
07003 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
31/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
31/12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2987 Built at Ruston & Hornsby Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
07/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 07003 |
|
|
04/10/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 07003 |
|
|
06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Industrial Sand: Oakmoor |
|
|