Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 34 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6249 Week
» 17954 Month
» 349443 Year
» 426030 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2988 16/06/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 07
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ruston & Hornsby
To Service 16/06/1962
Withdrawn 06/05/1973
Time in Service 10 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1973
Cut At Locomotive Works (Eastleigh)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
71I Southampton Docks (New) 16/06/1962
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 07/02/1966
   Withdrawn 06/05/1973


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/06/1962 To Service To service as D2988
Built at Ruston & Hornsby
Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I)
   
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/05/1973 Withdrawn Condemned as D2988    
01/11/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh    

prev prev