Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2990 13/07/1962
TOPS (Tops) 07006 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 07
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ruston & Hornsby
To Service 13/07/1962
Withdrawn 02/07/1977
Time in Service 14 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1984
Cut At P D Fuels (Kidwelly)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
71I Southampton Docks (New) 13/07/1962
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 07/02/1966
   Withdrawn 02/07/1977


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/07/1962 To Service To service as D2990
Built at Ruston & Hornsby
Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I)
   
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 07006    
02/07/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 07006    
01/10/1984 Scrapped Broken up by P D Fuels: Kidwelly    

prev prev