Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 787 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5388 Week
» 16935 Month
» 416617 Year
» 493204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2991 21/07/1962
TOPS (Tops) 07007

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 07
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ruston & Hornsby
To Service 21/07/1962
Withdrawn 06/05/1973
Time in Service 10 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
71I Southampton Docks (New) 21/07/1962
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 07/02/1966
   Withdrawn 06/05/1973

Preservation
Current Status Operational
Status Date 03/07/2012
Information In regular use at Eastleigh Works as Works shunter. Previously used as a static generator before falling out of use in the mid 1980's.


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/07/1962 To Service To service as D2991
Built at Ruston & Hornsby
Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I)
   
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
06/05/1973 Withdrawn Condemned as D2991    

prev prev