Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 851 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18654 Week
» 71670 Month
» 191197 Year
» 3218050 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2991 |
21/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
07007 |
|
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/07/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Operational |
Status Date |
03/07/2012 |
Information |
In regular use at Eastleigh Works as Works shunter. Previously used as a static generator before falling out of use in the mid 1980's. |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2991 Built at Ruston & Hornsby Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
07/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 07007 but not taken up |
|
|
06/05/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2991 from Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|