Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 119 Today
» 889 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 19637 Month
» 309029 Year
» 820131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2993 21/08/1962
TOPS (Tops) 07009 01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 07
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ruston & Hornsby
To Service 21/08/1962
Withdrawn 04/10/1976
Time in Service 14 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1977
Cut At Unknown (Trieste, Italy)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
71I Southampton Docks (New) 21/08/1962
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 07/02/1966
   Withdrawn 04/10/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/08/1962 To Service To service as D2993
Built at Ruston & Hornsby
Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I)
   
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
09/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 07009    
04/10/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 07009    
31/03/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Unknown: Trieste, Italy    

prev prev