Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 119 Today
» 889 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 19637 Month
» 309029 Year
» 820131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2994 05/09/1962
TOPS (Tops) 07010 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 07
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ruston & Hornsby
To Service 05/09/1962
Withdrawn 04/10/1976
Time in Service 14 yrs , 29 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
71I Southampton Docks (New) 05/09/1962
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 07/02/1966
BM Bournemouth m/e 31/10/1975
   Withdrawn 04/10/1976

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/09/1962 To Service To service as D2994
Built at Ruston & Hornsby
Allocated to Southampton Docks (71I)
   
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 07010    
31/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM)    
04/10/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 07010    

prev prev