Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 313 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3775 Week
» 23508 Month
» 320522 Year
» 397109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3 19/09/1959
TOPS (Tops) 44003 10/03/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
SKIDDAW 19/09/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 19/09/1959
Withdrawn 17/07/1976
Time in Service 16 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 08/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) 19/09/1959
17A Derby w/e 19/09/1959
1B Camden w/e 23/04/1960
5A Crewe North w/e 14/05/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Stored 4w/e 17/04/1976
   Withdrawn 17/07/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
19/09/1959 To Service To service as D3, name: SKIDDAW
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
14/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/03/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Test house.   Link
06/04/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed RO 4/1972 Link
10/03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 44003    
17/04/1976 To Store To Store    
17/07/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 44003    
08/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev prev