Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 18 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6233 Week
» 17938 Month
» 349427 Year
» 426014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13000 01/11/1952
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3000 31/05/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 01/11/1952
Withdrawn 19/11/1972
Time in Service 20 yrs , 18 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) 01/11/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/12/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/11/1961
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 29/11/1964
86A Cardiff Canton 5w/e 27/09/1969
82A Bristol Bath Road q/e 14/11/1970
   Withdrawn 19/11/1972

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/11/1952 To Service To service as 13000
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
18/05/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to D3000    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
27/09/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
14/11/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
19/11/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D3000    

prev