Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 455 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18258 Week
» 71274 Month
» 190801 Year
» 3217654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3002 |
29/01/1960 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
29/01/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3002 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company, Works Number 1084 Allocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (LMW) |
|
|
02/11/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3002 |
|
|
01/01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|