Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E3003 27/02/1960
TOPS 81002 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 81
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Works Number 1085
To Service 27/02/1960
Withdrawn 01/10/1990
Time in Service 30 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
LMW London Midland - Western Lines m/e 05/11/1960
GW Glasgow Shields Road w/e 29/03/1975
   Withdrawn 01/10/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1972 Air Brakes fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/02/1960 To Service To service as E3003
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
   
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (LMW)    
27/07/1969 Sightings Crewe Works visit: New erecting shop RO 9/1969 Link
06/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/06/1972 Sightings On Crewe Works - Fresh from overhaul    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 81002    
29/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GW)    
01/10/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 81002    

prev prev