Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1130 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8584 Week
» 11166 Month
» 275799 Year
» 1497364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E3009 07/10/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class 81
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Works Number 1091
To Service 07/10/1960
Withdrawn 24/08/1968
Time in Service 7 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1968
Cut At Locomotive Works Crewe, Cheshire
Video Clip Pathe news report on the Hixon disaster.
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn on 24/08/1968


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/10/1960 To Service To service as E3009
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
   
06/01/1968 Sightings On 6th January 1968, E3009 was working the 11:30 Manchester-Euston when it was in a massive collision at Hixon in Staffordshire. It hit a 148ft long transporter vehicle that was moving a 120 ton electrical transformer for storage at Hixon airfield while travelling at 75mph. The locomotive and first 5 carriages were destroyed and it is perhaps fortunate that only eleven people were killed as the carnage was great. A detailed report can be found at Wikipedia and the Government report is viewable here. http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Hixon_rail_crash  
01/08/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    
24/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as E3009    

prev prev