Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2787 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16193 Week
» 69209 Month
» 188736 Year
» 3215589 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13014 |
24/12/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3014 |
24/12/1960 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
232 |
To Service |
24/12/1952 to Hither Green (73C) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/1972 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/12/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13014 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
05/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
24/12/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3014 |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
01/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3014 |
|
|