Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1394 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19197 Week
» 72213 Month
» 191740 Year
» 3218593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13023 |
13/06/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3023 |
02/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08016 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/06/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/06/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13023 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3023 |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
22/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08016 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
18/05/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08016 from Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|