Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1903 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15309 Week
» 68325 Month
» 187852 Year
» 3214705 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13026 |
03/10/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3026 |
08/01/1959 |
At Derby Works |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13026 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
08/01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3026 |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3026 from Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|