Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E3026 04/08/1960
TOPS 83003 24/02/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 83
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 2930/E266
To Service 04/08/1960
Withdrawn 04/05/1975
Time in Service 14 yrs , 9 mths
Cut Up 30/06/1975
Cut At Locomotive Works Crewe, Cheshire
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
GS Glasgow Shields Road w/e 26/01/1974
LG Longsight (Electric) w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 04/05/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1973 Air Braked only


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/08/1960 To Service To service as E3026
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
10/04/1971 Sightings In store at Bury Shed: In store   Link
02/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
24/02/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 83003    
26/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS)    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (Electric) (LG)    
04/05/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 83003    
30/06/1975 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev