Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13029 03/10/1953
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3029 24/12/1957
TOPS (Tops) 08021 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 03/10/1953
Withdrawn 07/12/1986 off Toton (TO)
Time in Service 33 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84E Tyseley (New) 03/10/1953
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 13/08/1960
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
16A Toton w/e 13/07/1968
   Withdrawn 07/12/1986

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/10/1953 To Service To service as 13029
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Tyseley (84E)
   
24/12/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to D3029    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
13/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08021    
07/12/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 08021 from Toton (TO)    

prev prev