Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 76 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2310 Week
» 23212 Month
» 23212 Year
» 1244777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E3029 04/10/1960
TOPS 83006 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 83
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 2933/E269
To Service 04/10/1960
Withdrawn 17/07/1983
Time in Service 22 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 31/10/1984
Cut At Vic Berry Leicester
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn 17/07/1983

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1972 Air Braked only


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/10/1960 To Service To service as E3029
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
10/04/1971 Sightings In store at Bury Shed: In store   Link
09/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 83006    
17/07/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 83006    
31/10/1984 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev