Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1861 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15267 Week
» 68283 Month
» 187810 Year
» 3214663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D303 |
18/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40103 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
18/11/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 09/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D303 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
14/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40103 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
07/02/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40103 |
|
|
04/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|