Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 206 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6918 Week
» 20022 Month
» 20022 Year
» 1241587 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E3030 27/10/1960
TOPS 83007 27/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 83
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 2934/E270
To Service 27/10/1960
Withdrawn 17/07/1983
Time in Service 22 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1984
Cut At Vic Berry Leicester
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn 17/07/1983

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1972 Air Braked only
01/1973 Air Braked only


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/10/1960 To Service To service as E3030
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
10/04/1971 Sightings In store at Bury Shed: In store   Link
12/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
27/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 83007    
17/07/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 83007    
31/12/1984 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev