Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 771 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14177 Week
» 67193 Month
» 186720 Year
» 3213573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13031 |
31/10/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3031 |
31/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08023 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13031 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
31/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3031 |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
16/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08023 |
|
|
25/09/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08023 from Chester West (CH) |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|