Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 150 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1225 Week
» 22127 Month
» 22127 Year
» 1243692 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E3031 11/11/1960
TOPS 83008 11/11/1972

Locomotive Specifics
Class 83
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 2935/E271
To Service 11/11/1960
Withdrawn 17/07/1983
Time in Service 22 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 30/11/1984
Cut At Vic Berry Leicester
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn 17/07/1983

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1972 Air Braked only


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/11/1960 To Service To service as E3031
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
10/04/1971 Sightings In store at Bury Shed: In store   Link
10/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/11/1972 Renumbered Renumbered to 83008    
17/07/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 83008    
30/11/1984 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev