Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 309 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18112 Week
» 71128 Month
» 190655 Year
» 3217508 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3032 |
25/11/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
83009 |
20/02/1972 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
25/11/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
02/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3032 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2936 |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
20/02/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 83009 |
|
|
26/09/1986 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
19/03/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 83009 |
|
|
05/08/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|