Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 772 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14178 Week
» 67194 Month
» 186721 Year
» 3213574 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3034 |
30/01/1960 |
TOPS (Tops) |
83011 |
05/02/1972 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
30/01/1960 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
02/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3034 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2938 |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/02/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 83011 |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
17/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 83011 |
|
|
30/11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|