Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13035 28/11/1953
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3035 05/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 28/11/1953
Withdrawn 17/12/1972
Time in Service 19 yrs , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84B Oxley (New) 28/11/1953
6D Shrewsbury w/e 11/03/1967
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 19/06/1971
41A Tinsley w/e 22/07/1972
   Withdrawn 17/12/1972
   Withdrawn 17/12/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/11/1953 To Service To service as 13035
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Oxley (84B)
   
05/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D3035    
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
19/06/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
27/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517 Link
22/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
17/12/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D3035    
01/05/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev