Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 206 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6918 Week
» 20022 Month
» 20022 Year
» 1241587 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E3035 03/07/1961
TOPS 83012 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 83
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 2941/E277
To Service 03/07/1961
Withdrawn 01/03/1989
Time in Service 27 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
WN Willesden (Reinstated) 17/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/03/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1972 Air Braked only


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1961 To Service To service as E3035
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
   
10/04/1971 Sightings In store at Bury Shed: In store   Link
07/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 83012    
17/05/1988 Reinstated Reinstated to Willesden (WN)    
01/03/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 83012    

prev