Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 642 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18445 Week
» 71461 Month
» 190988 Year
» 3217841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3035 |
03/07/1961 |
TOPS (Tops) |
83012 |
07/07/1972 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
03/07/1961 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
07/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3035 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2941 |
|
|
07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/07/1972 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 83012 |
|
|
17/05/1988 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
01/03/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 83012 |
|
|