Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 15 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6861 Week
» 18408 Month
» 418090 Year
» 494677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13036 28/11/1953
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3036 20/11/1957
TOPS (Tops) 08026 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 28/11/1953
Withdrawn 04/07/1982 off Cambridge (CA)
Time in Service 28 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1986
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84B Oxley (New) 28/11/1953
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
16A Toton w/e 27/07/1968
MC March w/e 21/07/1973
   Withdrawn 04/07/1982


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/11/1953 To Service To service as 13036
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Oxley (84B)
   
20/11/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to D3036    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
21/07/1973 Allocation Reallocated to March (MC)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08026    
04/07/1982 Withdrawn Condemned as 08026 from Cambridge (CA)    
01/04/1986 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev