Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1442 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14848 Week
» 67864 Month
» 187391 Year
» 3214244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13039 |
28/11/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3039 |
02/01/1959 |
At Derby Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08027 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13039 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
02/01/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3039 |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08027 |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08027 from Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|