Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1421 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14827 Week
» 67843 Month
» 187370 Year
» 3214223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13040 |
22/01/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3040 |
11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08028 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/01/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/01/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13040 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3040 |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08028 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
31/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
05/04/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08028 from Bury (BV) |
|
|
04/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|