Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3414 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16820 Week
» 69836 Month
» 189363 Year
» 3216216 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
627 |
m/e |
01/1893 |
Southern Railway (Reg) |
E627 |
y/e |
1923 |
Southern Railway |
627 |
m/e |
11/1931 |
British Railways |
30627 |
m/e |
Not applied |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1893 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
WDN |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
on |
31/12/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/02/1948 |
Brighton Works |
'E4' S2509 came off shops on 10/2, and SCC1 (still green) with new lettering on the following day. Three of the new lot of 'Battle of Britain' class are already in course of erection; No. 171 should be out early in March. Of the U.S.A. 0-6-OT, only No. 1264 remains in the works (Porter 7420 of 1942) which it is understood will become No. 61. Nos. 62-74 are Vulcan-built, and in Southern livery except that the last is still working as 4326 and that S64 is in the British Railways livery. Three of the seven remaining 'A.12's' in the stock list were noted at work: Nos. 627, 629, and 636 |
SLS/194803 |
29/07/1948 |
Eastleigh MPD |
29/7: Nos. 627 an 629, the last two 'A.12's,' are still in regular service on the usual local trips |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1893 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 627 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4526 |
|
|
1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E627 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 627 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 30627 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 627 |
|
|
27/01/1949 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Eastleigh |
|
|