Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 906 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1806 Week
» 13627 Month
» 182399 Year
» 1066780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 177 m/e 12/1889
SR (Pfx) E177 m/e 01/1927
SR (1931) 177 m/e 05/1933
BR 30177 m/e 05/1948

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LSWR Maunsell Green Black and White 01/1927
BR Black Red and White 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class O2
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
Order Number O2
To Service During 12/1889
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/10/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 69 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DOR Dorchester 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 26/05/1953
70B Feltham 3w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 71C Dorchester 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 9w/e 26/05/1953
TOSTORE 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 70B Feltham P 31/10/1956
WDN   w/e 03/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1889 To Service To service as LSWR Number 177
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/1927 Livery Change of livery to Maunsell Lined Green    
01/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to E177    
05/1933 Renumbered Renumbered to 177    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dorchester (DOR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30177    
08/1951 Livery Change of livery to    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
20/07/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30177    

prev