Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
177 |
m/e |
12/1889 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E177 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
177 |
m/e |
05/1933 |
British Railways |
30177 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
01/1927 |
BR Black |
Red and White |
08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
O2 |
To Service |
During 12/1889 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/10/1959 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1889 |
DOR |
|
Dorchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
26/05/1953 |
70B |
|
Feltham |
3w/e |
17/11/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
71C |
Dorchester |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
9w/e |
26/05/1953 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
08/02/1955 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
P |
31/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1889 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 177 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E177 |
|
|
05/1933 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 177 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30177 |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30177 |
|
|