Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2934 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16340 Week
» 69356 Month
» 188883 Year
» 3215736 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
179 |
m/e |
03/1890 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E179 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
179 |
m/e |
08/1934 |
British Railways |
30179 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
07/1926 |
BR Black |
Red and White |
02/1954 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
O2 |
To Service |
During 03/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/12/1959 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DOR |
Dorchester |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
TOSTORE |
71C |
Dorchester |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
TOSTORE |
71C |
Dorchester |
2w/e |
13/08/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
TOSTORE |
71A |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
REINS |
70B |
Feltham |
P |
31/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (on 'dump') |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1890 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 179 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
07/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E179 |
|
|
08/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 179 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30179 |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
30/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30179 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|