Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 182 m/e 05/1890
SR (Pfx) E182 m/e 11/1924
SR (1931) 182 m/e 10/1931
BR 30182 m/e 12/1949

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LSWR Maunsell Green Black and White 11/1924
BR Black Red and White 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class O2
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
Order Number O2
To Service During 05/1890
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/01/1960
Total Mileage 1,781,720
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 69 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PLY Plymouth Friary 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72C Yeovil Town 6w/e 27/03/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 13/10/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 09/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 30/09/1958
WDN   w/e 09/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1890 To Service To service as LSWR Number 182
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
11/1924 Livery Change of livery to Maunsell Lined Green    
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to E182    
10/1931 Renumbered Renumbered to 182    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30182    
08/1951 Livery Change of livery to    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 30182    

prev prev