Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3705 Week
» 9839 Month
» 237723 Year
» 1459288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 183 m/e 05/1890
SR (Pfx) E183 m/e 10/1924
SR (1931) 183 m/e 09/1933
BR 30183 m/e 07/1948

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LSWR Maunsell Green Black and White 10/1924
BR Black Red and White 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class O2
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
Order Number O2
To Service During 05/1890
Withdrawal Sat 30/09/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 71 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1890
PLY Plymouth Friary 01/01/1948
71D Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 29/10/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 15/06/1956
72D Plymouth Friary 5w/e 19/07/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 30/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71D Fratton 6w/e 20/07/1953
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 18/11/1953
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 5w/e 19/07/1957
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
WDN   m/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/01/1948 Eastleigh Works Amongst engines awaiting Works on 11/1, the following are of interest: 96 SOT; 182, 183 PLY; 203 WAD; 238 YE0 and 531 RED. No. 921 is freshly repainted ex Works. SLS/194802
25/10/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). SLS/195112
05/09/1961 Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1890 To Service To service as London and South Western Railway Number 183
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to E183    
09/1933 Renumbered Renumbered to 183    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30183    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
29/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
19/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
30/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30183    

prev prev