Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1008 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14414 Week
» 67430 Month
» 186957 Year
» 3213810 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
195 |
m/e |
12/1890 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E195 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
195 |
m/e |
05/1936 |
Southern Railway (IOW) |
W15 |
m/e |
05/1936 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
0000 |
COWES |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
09/1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
B3 |
To Service |
During 12/1890 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1956 |
Service Life |
65 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1890 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
71EF |
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
70G |
Newport (I.O.W.) |
7w/e |
01/11/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1951 |
Isle of Wight Notes |
Still green : W27 Merstone, W31 Chale, W32 Bonchurch, W33 Bembridge. W33 now has an Adams boiler (fitted since October 1950). W15, W19, W20 (green in October) now black. All Ryde engines are now black, lined, and beautifully clean. |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1890 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 195 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E195 |
|
|
05/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 195 |
|
|
05/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to W15 |
|
|
05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15 |
|
|
05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 195 |
|
|