Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 38 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5470 Week
» 17291 Month
» 186063 Year
» 1070444 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 197 m/e 06/1891
SR (Pfx) E197 m/e 03/1925
SR (1931) 197 m/e 04/1932
BR 30197 m/e 07/1949

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LSWR Maunsell Green Black and White 03/1925
BR Black Red and White 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class O2
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
Order Number K3
To Service During 06/1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/02/1953
Scrapping During 03/1953
Service Life 61 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PLY Plymouth Friary 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 07/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOR Dorchester 4w/e 31/07/1949
TOSTORE 71C Dorchester 2w/e 13/08/1952
WDN   w/e 07/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1891 To Service To service as LSWR Number 197
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
03/1925 Livery Change of livery to Maunsell Lined Green    
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to E197    
04/1932 Renumbered Renumbered to 197    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY)    
07/1949 Livery Change of livery to    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30197    
02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 30197    

prev prev