Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 800 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18603 Week
» 71619 Month
» 191146 Year
» 3217999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
197 |
m/e |
06/1891 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E197 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
197 |
m/e |
04/1932 |
British Railways |
30197 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
03/1925 |
BR Black |
Red and White |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
K3 |
To Service |
During 06/1891 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/02/1953 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1891 |
PLY |
|
Plymouth Friary |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
DOR |
|
Dorchester |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
DOR |
Dorchester |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
TOSTORE |
71C |
Dorchester |
2w/e |
13/08/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |
12/05/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops : 30066, (300)68, 30082/331/56/74/477/90/7, 30501/30/77/84/783/90/7/829/920/33/54, 34002/6/7/30/49/79/99/103, 35019, also 2101 with large numerals on tanks as pre-war, and 2138, renumbered 32138 on one side only. Being cut up: (30)305/414. Still waiting to be cut up: (30)116. Ex shops: 30061/197/470/570/89/781, 34055, 35010. |
SLS/195107 |
28/02/1953 |
Eastleigh Works |
Scrapped in February: 30415. For scrap. 30197, 30204, 30754, 32694. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1891 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 197 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E197 |
|
|
04/1932 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 197 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30197 |
|
|
31/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dorchester (DOR) |
|
|
07/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30197 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|