Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 325 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 325 Week
» 7509 Month
» 315490 Year
» 1199871 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 199 m/e 06/1891
SR (Pfx) E199 m/e 07/1926
SR (1931) 199 m/e 11/1933
BR 30199 m/e 09/1949

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LSWR Maunsell Green Black and White 07/1926
BR Black Red and White 05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class O2
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
Order Number K3
To Service During 06/1891
Withdrawal Sun 23/12/1962
Scrapping During 12/1963
Service Life 71 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72D Plymouth Friary 9w/e 12/06/1957
72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 19/07/1957
71A Eastleigh m/e 09/11/1961
   Withdrawn 23/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 71C Dorchester m/e 31/08/1950
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 13/08/1952
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 26/05/1953
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 19/07/1957
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 09/11/1961
WDN   23/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1891 To Service To service as LSWR Number 199
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
07/1926 Livery Change of livery to Maunsell Lined Green    
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to E199    
11/1933 Renumbered Renumbered to 199    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30199    
05/1952 Livery Change of livery to    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
19/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
23/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30199    

prev prev